Trustees BOSENCE FARM COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1088236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Maggs Trustee 16 October 2020
None on record
Ruth Mounstephen Trustee 29 July 2020
None on record
Karon Clark Trustee 16 January 2020
None on record
Gail Hunt Trustee 26 July 2016
THE WINNIFRED POTTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Malcolm Rosser Jones Trustee 07 November 2013
None on record
MARY WINIFRED VYVYAN Trustee 07 November 2013
None on record
CLIVE HARROLD Trustee
West Cornwall Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
PENGARTH TALKING NEWSPAPER
Received: On time
GOOD OLD FURNITURE AVAILABLE (GOFA)
Received: On time
PENZANCE AND WEST PENWITH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
PENWITH GATEWAY CLUB
Received: On time
PENGARTH DAY CENTRE
Recently registered