VOICE OF HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voice of Hope is a Christian Church which aims to provide love and support for the community in a way that brings honour to our Saviour Jesus Christ. We provide courses based around marriage, drugs awareness, family life etc. as well as running kids club and fun days for young people of all ages. Part of Market Weighton Churches Together, Ground Level plus Revive Collective, a group of Churches .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 October 2000: Standard registration
- THE WOLDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bharti Gretton | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN OXLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ANTHONY RILEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.41k | £21.71k | £12.62k | £4.56k | £1.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.85k | £24.50k | £5.94k | £3.70k | £2.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 1 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF EAST YORKSHIRE AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY: (A) CONDUCTING PUBLIC MEETINGS FOR BIBLE TEACHING PRAISE AND PRAYER. (B) TRAINING LEADERS OF CHRISTIAN GROUPS WHOSE PURPOSES ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (C) PROVIDING VISITING SPEAKERS (D) OFFERING SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE BASED ON BIBLICAL TEACHINGS (E) ESTABLISHING A CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP. (F) ALL OTHER LAWFUL MEANS WHICH ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
EAST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 HILL RISE
MARKET WEIGHTON
YORK
YO43 3JX
- Phone:
- 01430626259
- Email:
- rileys37@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window