CHURCH PLANTING INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church Planting Initiative is helping to found new self-governing evangelical churches in the UK. It makes some financial grants to those organisations or individuals who are closely engaged with it in such church planting, and to those organisations and individuals only. It also provides a helpful network to assist church planters of such churches
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 February 2001: Standard registration
- CPI (Working name)
- M4 Church Planting (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GILES ARNOLD CHARTERED SURVEYOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JAMES GEORGE MARTIN ERWIN | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||
John Mark Townley | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.21k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £21.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.62k | £93 | £13 | £13 | £14.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 18TH FEBRUARY 2000 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9TH FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED THE TRUSTEES) MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Barn
Baines Lane
Seaton
OAKHAM
Rutland
LE15 9HP
- Phone:
- 01536 201339
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window