THE LIFEBUOY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A residential drug rehabilitation facility offering a 9 month abstinance basic programme to achieve a drug & crime free lifestyle, gainfully employed in a gratifying job.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 10 April 2001: Standard registration
- 21 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LIFEBUOY CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.82k | £81.66k | £111.22k | £97.08k | £203.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.97k | £91.70k | £119.27k | £113.69k | £126.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 26 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 26 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 12 March 2009 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 12 March 2009 | 40 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 07 March 2008 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 07 March 2008 | 36 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN ADDICTED TO DRUGS..
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window