NEW WINE TRUST

Charity number: 1084415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 03 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 18 August 2016 On time Download