THE ROYAL ASSOCIATION FOR DEAF PEOPLE

Charity number: 1081949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.34m £3.02m £2.53m £2.62m £3.22m
Total expenditure £3.36m £3.26m £3.40m £3.04m £2.98m
Income from government contracts £449.63k £446.03k £1.12m £554.42k £495.68k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £372.19k £497.11k £224.47k £320.77k £1.09m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.36m £2.39m £2.18m £2.15m £2.00m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £137.65k £137.06k £129.49k £144.56k £140.41k
Income - Other £468.49k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £230.14k £460.31k £191.94k £265.49k £1.00m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.32m £3.22m £3.14m £2.72m £2.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.03k £40.11k £260.57k £322.61k £243.16k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £8.59k £9.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0