THE ACADEMY OF ENTERPRISE

Charity number: 1087850
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2009 Overdue Overdue by 4026 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Overdue Overdue by 4026 days
Annual return 30 June 2008 02 April 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 02 April 2009 On time
Annual return 30 June 2007 10 June 2008 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 10 June 2008 41 days late
Annual return 30 June 2006 27 April 2007 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 11 May 2007 11 days late
Annual return 30 June 2005 15 June 2006 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 20 June 2006 51 days late