Trustees CATALYST STOCKTON ON TEES LIMITED

Charity number: 1083231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Guru Naidoo Chair 03 February 2014
INCLUSION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Victoria Wilkinson Trustee 29 November 2021
CITIZENS ADVICE COUNTY DURHAM
Received: On time
Andrew Carlton ACMA CGMA Trustee 29 November 2021
None on record
Dr Michael Fearn Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
Dr Helen Dudiak Trustee 12 November 2018
ACTES TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher David Marshall Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
LESLEY COOKE Trustee 05 August 2015
BUTTERWICK LIMITED
Received: On time
EASTERN RAVENS TRUST
Received: On time
Steven Iianson Nelson Trustee 07 July 2015
None on record