Trustees YMCA SOUTH DEVON

Charity number: 1086783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANE INETT Chair 23 March 2015
BRIXHAM BOWLING CLUB
Recently registered
PATRICK BASIL STAPLETON Trustee 07 March 2022
None on record
JOHANNA MORRELL Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record
ELEANOR SIAN SIRIOL CHRISTMAS Trustee 09 March 2020
None on record
Rev GARY DEIGHTON Trustee 08 May 2017
None on record
RACHEL MURCH Trustee 11 April 2016
None on record
MARIA GOODWIN Trustee 23 March 2015
None on record