THE MUSLIM COUNCIL OF BRITAIN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1084651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 March 2019 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 March 2019 133 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 November 2017 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 November 2017 14 days late Download