THE MUSLIM COUNCIL OF BRITAIN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1084651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £58.49k £71.01k £174.66k £166.15k £328.71k
Total expenditure £75.57k £43.29k £170.02k £307.73k £293.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A