THE GRAHAM TURNBULL MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1082393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 February 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 20 February 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 February 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 20 February 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 20 February 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 February 2017 Not Required