THE GRAHAM TURNBULL MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1082393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 20/02/2017 20/02/2018 20/02/2019 20/02/2020 20/02/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £500 £500 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A