CAMP THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance general education in the art of drama and the development of public apreciation of such art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 15 January 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH JANE CLARKE | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN JEFFERIES | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/04/2020 | 09/04/2021 | 09/04/2022 | 09/04/2023 | 09/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.52k | £195 | £6.58k | £11.88k | £15.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.79k | £1.19k | £5.51k | £11.21k | £10.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 April 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 April 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 7 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE GENERAL EDUCATION IN THE ART OF DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART. TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Fourgates
Menheniot
Liskeard
PL14 3SR
- Phone:
- 01579 347462
- Email:
- JAM_FAM@TISCALI.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window