WHITWORTH WATER SKI AND RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1086892
Charity reporting is overdue by 1692 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £59.50k £73.33k £60.09k £58.71k £51.08k
Total expenditure £70.13k £66.36k £67.07k £63.51k £55.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A