Financial history DAME ALLAN'S SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1084965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £10.42m £16.07m £12.97m £12.61m £13.13m
Total expenditure £10.17m £15.24m £11.67m £12.13m £12.66m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £80.83k £127.73k N/A £178.61k £190.73k
Income - Donations and legacies £89.72k £357.86k £522.32k £277.62k £243.83k
Income - Other trading activities £11.52k £18.22k £13.43k £7.16k £12.25k
Income - Charitable activities £10.00m £15.66m £11.19m £11.59m £12.86m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.63k £32.29k £13.43k £30.70k £13.98k
Income - Other £307.07k £0 £1.23m £705.67k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.86m £14.85m £11.33m £11.82m £12.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £349.37k £305.10k £230.07k
Expenditure - Governance £9.32k £9.60k £0 £0 £15.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.60k
Expenditure - Other £310.97k £385.33k £0 £0 £0