CHARLTON PARK SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1081956
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 March 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 July 2019 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required