AN-NOOR ISLAMIC SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides tuition for home-schooled children in a variety of National Curriculum subjects. Extra curricular activities/clubs/classes for children and adults in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hounslow
Governance
- 18 April 2001: Standard registration
- WEST LONDON EDUCATION TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lubna Khan | Chair | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Musa Kobi | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr AHSAN KARIM MIRZA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.71k | £22.50k | £29.58k | £46.98k | £87.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.20k | £19.64k | £27.01k | £54.95k | £75.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE FAITH OF ISLAM, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 New Heston Road
HOUNSLOW
TW5 0LJ
- Phone:
- 02087599995
- Email:
- lubna_a786@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window