Accounts and annual returns WATFORD ASIAN COMMUNITY CARE

Charity number: 1084732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 30 June 2020 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required