FRIENDS OF THE LONDON ORATORY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activities of the charity each year are to raise funds primarily from parental contributions and to remit these funds to The London Oratory School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 31 August 2000: Standard registration
- 13 May 2025: Funds received from 1158059 THE LONDON ORATORY SCHOOL FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Adams | Chair | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charles Vincent De Paul Doyle | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Father John George Bowen | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Patrick Maher | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Francis Wright | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £368.00k | £308.98k | £281.25k | £318.68k | £498.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £400.81k | £160.62k | £175.51k | £565.00k | £574.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CHARITABLE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE LONDON ORATORY SCHOOL AND THE WELFARE AND EDUCATION OF THE REGISTERED PUPILS IN ATTENDANCE AT THE LONDON ORATORY SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LONDON ORATORY SCHOOL
SEAGRAVE ROAD
LONDON
SW6 1RX
- Phone:
- 02073817648
- Email:
- friends@london-oratory.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window