YMCA BLACK COUNTRY GROUP

Charity number: 1086320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.25m £6.78m £7.75m £7.38m £6.85m
Total expenditure £5.96m £6.49m £7.23m £6.97m £6.66m
Income from government contracts £848.07k £686.56k £905.77k £790.40k £350.27k
Income from government grants £1.26m £336.14k £271.02k £480.84k £843.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £22.06k £52.40k £37.18k £112.63k £75.21k
Income - Other trading activities £99.24k £91.38k £1.14k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.99m £6.63m £7.71m £7.27m £6.77m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.87k £6.10k £148 £3.01k £4.18k
Income - Other £1.12m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.86m £6.43m £7.23m £6.97m £6.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £96.62k £62.93k £1.26k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £38.47k £47.27k £60.87k £91.25k £96.64k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0