CREDO STORYTELLERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ENCOURAGE THE ART OF ORAL STORYTELLING IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR TO REVIVE THE LOST ART OF BIBLICAL STORYTELLING. WE DO THIS AGAINST A BACKDROP OF MUSIC ,ART AND POETRY IN AN ATMOSPHERE OF RESPECT, CONVIVIALITY AND COMMUNITY. THE ETHOS OF SHARING AND HOSPITABLY IS AT THE HEART OF WHAT WE DO. WE ARE A GROUP OF PERFORMING ARTISTS WORKING IN THE FIELDS OF FILM, POETRY,THEATRE AND EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 2000: Standard registration
- 15 July 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.09k | £6.60k | £2.51k | £620 | £90 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.79k | £2.43k | £7.09k | £756 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 07 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 10 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 05 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 26TH JULY 2000 AND AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 19TH SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART, PRACTICE AND VALUE OF STORYTELLING PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE JUDAEO-CHRISTIAN TRADITION OF STORYTELLING BY THE PERFORMANCE OF, AND TRAINING IN, STORYTELLING AND OTHER RELATED ARTS AND BY RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY AND CULTURAL SIGNIFICANCE OF THE JUDAEO-CHRISTIAN ORAL TRADITION AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window