St Mary's PTA (Carshalton)

Charity number: 1083151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required