St Mary's PTA (Carshalton)

Charity number: 1083151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.61k £11.61k £15.30k £4.38k £21.60k
Total expenditure £10.93k £4.94k £27.76k £6.30k £844
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A