Trustees THE FRIENDS OF DONINGTON-LE-HEATH MANOR HOUSE
Charity number: 1084997

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER HOLLOWAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Helen Barbara Whittaker | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Carr | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Smith | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Sutton | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Chapman | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andy Albon | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hanford-Dodgson | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA THOMPSON | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNN OVERTON | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN ARKLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE GWENDOLINE ARKLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.