Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST. EDMUND'S CHURCH

Charity number: 1082600
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 July 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 01 July 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 August 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required