Financial history FRIENDS OF ST. EDMUND'S CHURCH

Charity number: 1082600
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £7.19k £7.82k £6.71k £7.87k £109.58k
Total expenditure £3.65k £5.84k £3.27k £4.74k £32.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A