THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN CHRYSOSTOM IN CHELTENHAM AND ENVIRONS

Charity number: 1083808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £27.06k £24.07k £45.69k £21.64k £36.00k
Total expenditure £20.78k £22.50k £28.85k £34.66k £46.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A