Financial history SCHOOL FOR SOCIAL ENTREPRENEURS

Charity number: 1085465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.59m £4.64m £5.16m £8.65m £9.36m
Total expenditure £5.43m £4.32m £5.26m £8.52m £9.48m
Income from government contracts N/A £18.17k £34.23k £13.48k £97.34k
Income from government grants £1.76k £152.85k £60.00k £174.09k £1.63m
Income - Donations and legacies £224.70k £176.99k £253.27k £183.57k £264.81k
Income - Other trading activities £54.74k £47.20k £47.79k £49.57k £32.11k
Income - Charitable activities £5.30m £4.41m £4.83m £8.35m £9.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.19k £8.77k £21.34k £5.15k £3.86k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £59.10k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.39m £4.28m £5.21m £8.48m £9.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.73k £37.12k £45.53k £36.47k £72.42k
Expenditure - Governance £53.18k £59.34k £64.90k £68.28k £51.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £816.86k £738.01k £788.34k £519.42k £537.28k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0