Financial history THE LOUISE DA-COCODIA EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1085379
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £39.54k £33.88k £35.41k £24.86k £34.13k
Total expenditure £38.89k £39.64k £41.31k £24.79k £20.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A