Accounts and annual returns THE NANI HUYU CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1082868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 22 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 17 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 24 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 17 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 27 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 22 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 21 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 21 September 2018 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window