Financial history THE NANI HUYU CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1082868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £182.23k £191.07k £208.70k £225.24k £191.30k
Total expenditure £166.68k £182.16k £191.83k £201.45k £199.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A