CHEW LAKE ASSOCIATION OF DISABLED SAILORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide dinghy sailing for physically disabled people. We sail most Saturdays from April to October.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 09 October 2000: Standard registration
- CLADS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Geoffrey Nash MBCS | Chair | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Slade | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Jane Northcott | Trustee | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.85k | £331 | £644 | £4.45k | £1.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.64k | £1.25k | £1.46k | £2.87k | £1.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUNE 2000 as amended on 28 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BY ENCOURAGING RECREATIONAL AND COMPETITIVE SAILING, IN THE COUNTY OF (BRISTOL / N SOMERSET) AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTIES OF BRISTOL AND NORTH SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 RODBOROUGH WAY
BRISTOL
BS15 9YQ
- Phone:
- 01179612466
- Email:
- info@clads.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window