OFF THE RECORD (BRISTOL)

Charity number: 1085351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.22m £1.64m £1.77m £1.49m £1.79m
Total expenditure £1.15m £1.60m £1.78m £1.49m £1.47m
Income from government contracts £594.31k £1.32m £834.23k N/A £721.95k
Income from government grants £96.80k £15.27k £58.86k £69.21k £112.84k
Income - Donations and legacies £16.27k £43.33k £83.35k £108.41k £175.19k
Income - Other trading activities £6.16k £0 £0 £0 £5.12k
Income - Charitable activities £1.20m £1.60m £1.66m £1.38m £1.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £129 £0 £24.99k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £11.30k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.60m £1.78m £1.48m £1.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £6.46k £41.06k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £20.00k £4.83k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0