OFF THE RECORD (BRISTOL)

Charity number: 1085351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Allen Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
Dr Jochen Binder-Dietrich Trustee 07 September 2015 None on record
Karen Drake Chair 06 March 2017 None on record
Lizzie Johnson Trustee 14 October 2019 None on record
Emma Carter Trustee 28 February 2019 None on record
Amanda Bancroft Trustee 07 September 2015 None on record
Benjamin Fotheringham Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
Dr RACHEL BROWN Trustee None on record
PATSY HUDSON Trustee 05 December 2016 None on record
Bryony Montandon Trustee 15 February 2021 None on record
Joseph Hartland Trustee 28 February 2019 None on record