SEFTON O.P.E.R.A.

Charity number: 1086437
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 07 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 12 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 27 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 19 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 19 April 2017 On time Download