EVERYMAN THEATRE CARDIFF LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to advance the public knowledge and appreciation of literature and drama by means of public performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Cardiff
Governance
- 20 September 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toby Harris | Chair | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelsey Penfold | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cressida Abigail McDougall Ford | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Brooks | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Day | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Francis SLACK | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Stanbury | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN OSMOLSKA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.01k | £13.25k | £82.89k | £229.43k | £255.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.14k | £41.19k | £42.84k | £246.27k | £282.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £32.83k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 October 2020 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 October 2020 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/10/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF LITERATURE AND DRAMA BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CARDIFF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHAPTER ARTS CENTRE
MARKET ROAD
CARDIFF
CF5 1QE
- Phone:
- 029 20311050
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window