Accounts and annual returns THE CRYSTAL ROGERS ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1083053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 28 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required