Financial history THE CRYSTAL ROGERS ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1083053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £13.09k £16.90k £10.76k £5.16k £502.94k
Total expenditure £18.17k £6.10k £17.44k £6.02k £14.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £502.75k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £186
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £500.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.05k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.05k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0