ALL AGE DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1084276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2019 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2016 06 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2016 Not Required