BRESSINGHAM AND FERSFIELD COMMUNITY HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1082541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 01 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 21 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 26 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required