THE POPLE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1097114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £35.79k £28.24k £33.32k £38.70k £30.05k
Total expenditure £19.25k £69.88k £14.52k £15.30k £11.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A