Financial history ST CUTHBERTS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (CHURCH TOWN)

Charity number: 1085385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £97.39k £126.65k £146.64k £140.81k £148.67k
Total expenditure £114.87k £100.97k £112.00k £121.38k £122.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.06k £107.34k £129.58k £123.82k