BARNSTAPLE IN BLOOM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We beautify the town by supplying and planting flower beds, and roundabouts, supply hanging baskets, and window boxes. We involve the schools and other organizations. We attempt to ensure that the town is kept clean and tidy, and free of litter. Each year we enter the Britain in Bloom competition, and have been extremely successful over the years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 12 December 2000: Standard registration
- 16 July 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.71k | £38.13k | £35.64k | £32.84k | £24.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.87k | £37.88k | £41.69k | £32.85k | £19.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 24 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 19 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 26 July 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 05 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 09 April 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT THE TOWN OF BARNSTAPLE BY PROVIDING ENCOURAGING THE PROVISION OF DISPLAY OF FLOWERS, SHRUBS AND LANDSCAPES IN PLACES VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
BARNSTAPLE NORTH DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window