CITIZENS ADVICE IN NORTH & WEST KENT

Charity number: 1082979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advice, information and support to members of our local communities on a range of issues, including debt, benefits, employment, housing and relationships. Also exercise a responsible and confidential influence on social policies locally and nationally.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 October 2000: Standard registration
  • 12 December 2015: Funds received from 1117352 TONBRIDGE & MALLING CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
  • 12 December 2015: Funds received from 1110484 SEVENOAKS AND SWANLEY CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LTD
  • 24 October 2019: Funds received from 1120649 DARTFORD CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
  • 27 March 2020: Funds received from 1140926 KENT AND MEDWAY CITIZENS ADVICE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • GRAVESHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Anne Janice Bryant Chair 24 July 2017
None on record
Richard John Hubble Trustee 08 October 2024
THE DEBNEY ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Keith Patrick Bonin Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Andrew John Cumming Trustee 07 May 2024
None on record
Thomas James Bourne Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
George Johnston Gordon Trustee 01 July 2022
TUNBRIDGE WELLS & DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
Elaine Margaret Abbs Trustee 01 July 2022
FRIENDS OF THE TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Received: On time
TUNBRIDGE WELLS & DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
Evelyn Cook Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
MARTIN WILLIAM MILES Trustee 24 July 2017
SCOTTS PROJECT TRUST
Received: On time
Christine Ann Grosskopf Trustee 06 December 2016
None on record
Robin Mark Eccles Thompson Trustee 06 December 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £986.45k £1.16m £1.41m £2.02m £2.07m
Total expenditure £1.03m £1.15m £1.50m £1.80m £2.04m
Income from government contracts £103.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £401.94k £435.44k £712.62k £923.21k £1.10m
Income - Donations and legacies £8.08k £277.13k £372.31k £887.43k £1.01m
Income - Other trading activities £28.45k £15.28k £18.32k £13.45k £17.14k
Income - Charitable activities £947.79k £865.83k £1.02m £862.29k £1.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.12k £449 £171 £7.21k £31.33k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £248.65k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £1.09m £1.48m £1.73m £2.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.17k £58.36k £20.68k £66.68k £32.01k
Expenditure - Governance £27.85k £17.14k £15.79k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £28.20k £20.02k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £91.12k £53.68k £16.25k £20.17k £31.74k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £563.28k £645.29k £642.26k £964.56k £1.12m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £26.07k £57.63k £109.21k £212.58k £348.69k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tonbridge Castle
Castle Street
Tonbridge
TN9 1BG
Phone:
03300533684