BALM IN GILEAD MINISTRIES BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1085635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 10 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 10 March 2020 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 02 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 09 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 22 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required