BALM IN GILEAD MINISTRIES BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1085635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A