BRATTON FLEMING MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1082822
Charity reporting is overdue by 1372 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 276 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 276 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 641 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 641 days
Annual return 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1007 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1007 days
Annual return 30 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1372 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1372 days
Annual return 30 April 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required