BRATTON FLEMING MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1082822
Charity reporting is overdue by 1378 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2012 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016
Total gross income £1.50k £1.50k £1.50k £11.50k £50
Total expenditure £1.84k £1.76k £1.66k £1.76k £11.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £11.50k N/A