Financial history BOURNEMOUTH NORTHBOURNE A TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1082523
Charity reporting is overdue by 1762 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2011 31/01/2012 31/01/2013 31/01/2014 31/01/2015
Total gross income £1.27k £2.40k £2.64k £2.59k £2.52k
Total expenditure £2.54k £2.53k £3.38k £2.52k £2.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A